O'Riordan, Michael David (CPSO#: 42084)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 28 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 May 1994
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jun 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1994
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Nov 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1996