O'Shaughnessy, Paul Martin (CPSO#: 63593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cottage Country Family Health Team
Unit 1
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone: (705) 687-2794
Fax: (705) 687-8652
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Martin O'Shaughnessy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. O'Shaughnessy ( CPSO# 63593 )

Business Address:
Cottage Country Family Health Team
1 - 5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone Number: (705) 687-2794

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL MARTIN O'SHAUGHNESSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SHAUGHNESSY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993