O'Shea, Timothy Michael (CPSO#: 77606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Cntr
Room A3 66
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 389-4411 Ext. 42471
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O'Shea and Verhovsek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. O'Shea ( CPSO# 77606 )
Dr. M. Verhovsek ( CPSO# 80732 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hopsital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Room F304
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6024

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY MICHAEL O'SHEA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SHEA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006