O'Sullivan, Brian (CPSO#: 32703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2122
Fax: (416) 946-6566
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian O'Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. O'Sullivan ( CPSO# 32703 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2122

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 04 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985