O'Sullivan, Colleen Mary (CPSO#: 85026)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 07 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012