O'Sullivan, Fiona Eva (CPSO#: 77560)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dual Diagnosis Services
CWSDS
53 Bond Street
Oakville ON  L6K 1L8
Phone: (905) 844-7864
Fax: (905) 849-0192
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sheridan Campus Health Services
Room B129
1430 Trafalgar Road
Oakville ON  L6H 2L1
Canada
Phone: (905) 845-9430 Ext. 2550
Fax: (905) 815-4012
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FIONA EVA O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2004