O'Sullivan, John James (CPSO#: 79967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
L L 2
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 719-3075
Fax: (705) 728-0349
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Hospital Of Barrie
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9802
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John J. O'Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. O'Sullivan ( CPSO# 79967 )

Business Address:
Royal Court Medical Centre
L L 2
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 719-3075

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 24 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN JAMES O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003