O'Sullivan, Joseph Patrick (CPSO#: 57435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 239-7167
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH PATRICK O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990