O'Sullivan, Rory John (CPSO#: 93366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
928 St Clair Ave West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C6
Phone: 416-603-5888
Fax: 416-603-5059
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rory O'Sullivan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. O'Sullivan ( CPSO# 93366 )

Business Address:
Garrison Creek Family Health Team
928 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C6
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 25 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RORY JOHN O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2013