O'Sullivan, Sean Joseph (CPSO#: 23060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Hyman Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 2C3
Phone: (519) 842-9429
Fax: (519) 842-3430
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.J. O'Sullivan, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Sullivan ( CPSO# 23060 )

Business Address:
25 Hyman Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 2C3
Phone Number: (519) 842-9429

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN JOSEPH O'SULLIVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'SULLIVAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1970