O'Sullivan, Timothy Joseph (CPSO#: 41476)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 23 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University College, Cork, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 23 Mar 1987