O'Toole, Eamon Augustine (CPSO#: 25674)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eamon A. O'Toole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Tel: 1 800 775 0093 Fax: 1 888 316 4125 Email: info@recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 03 Nov 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016