O'Toole, Francis Joseph (CPSO#: 57987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L7
Phone: (905) 575-0611
Fax: (905) 575-7737
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: FJ O'Toole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. F. O'Toole ( CPSO# 57987 )

Business Address:
Unit 12
1300 Garth Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 4L7
Phone Number: (905) 575-0611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCIS JOSEPH O'TOOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'TOOLE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1988