Oake, Jeffrey Stuart (CPSO#: 62783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Box 222
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4500
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oake ( CPSO# 62783 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Division of Urology
Box 222
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY STUART OAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OAKE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1990