Oandasan, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 66838)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Faisal Specialist Hospital and
Research Center, MBC 93
Department of Mental Health
PO Box 3354
Riyadh 11211
Saudi Arabia
Phone: 966114647272 Ext. 36357
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PsychCare Clinics
Dabab Street
Sulaymania
Riyadh 11587
Saudi Arabia
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +96614633144
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LYNN OANDASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OANDASAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998