Oandasan, Ivy Felicidad (CPSO#: 64065)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing, 2nd Floor
2W404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 603-5448
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oandasan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Oandasan ( CPSO# 64065 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing, 2nd Floor
2W404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IVY FELICIDAD OANDASAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OANDASAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Feb 1996
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1992