Obasi, Chinyere Ngozi (CPSO#: 67408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:University of Ibadan, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Good Samaritian Specialists Clinic
3219 Central Avenue
Suite 200
Kearney NE  68847
United States
Phone: (308) 440-2802
Fax: (308) 865-2169

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Nebraska

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 31 Jul 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHINYERE NGOZI OBASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBASI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Jul 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2008