Obead, Khaireldeen Hasan Nimer (CPSO#: 97113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 2017

Expiry Date:  08 May 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Mosul, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Obead Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Obead ( CPSO# 97113 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (416) 846-1192

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 May 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 02 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 May 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 May 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Khaireldeen  Hasan  Obead  may practise family medicine at Stevenson
                  Memorial  Hospital  in  Alliston,  Ontario,   while   under   supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of registration automatically expires three years  from
                  the date of issuance  or when Dr. Obead's eligibility to take the College
                  of  Family Physicians of  Canada  examination  expires,  whichever  comes
                  first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor  notifies  the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Obead's knowledge, skill, judgment  or  attitude,  does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to the College by the due date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Obead's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on  May  9, 2017, and will expire on or before
                  May 8, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.