Obeda, Michael John (CPSO#: 106408)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 CF Health Services Cnt
8 Wing Trenton
PO Box 1000 Station Forces
50 Yukon St
Astra ON  K0K 3W0
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN OBEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBEDA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 25 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2017