Oberman, Saul Streetter (CPSO#: 83631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
232 Boul St-Joseph
Gatineau QC  J8Y 3X4
Phone: (819) 778-3455

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAUL STREETTER OBERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OBERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2014