Obeyesekere, Manoj Niranjan (CPSO#: 92505)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Monash University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Feb 2010 to 23 Apr 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Apr 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 09 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Dec 2011