Obied, Ali Ahmed Mohamed (CPSO#: 69583)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 07 Jul 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 07 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 07 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 1998 to 07 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 08 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002