Ocana Fernandez, Alberto (CPSO#: 90209)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad de Alcala de Henares, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2009 to 26 Apr 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Jul 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2012