Oda, Joanna Jennifer Chandler (CPSO#: 101998)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office of the Commissioner
and Medical Officer of Health
1151 Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 3L1
Phone: 905-825-6000 Ext. 2639
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2012 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA JENNIFER CHANDLER ODA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Nov 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2017