Odejayi, Gbolahan Olatokunbo Bamidele (CPSO#: 96496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Olabisi Onabanjo University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
West 5th Campus
100 West 5th Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 0E3
Phone: 905-522-1155 Ext. 36814
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GBOLAHAN OLATOKUNBO BAMIDELE ODEJAYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODEJAYI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016