Odell, Margaret Ruth (CPSO#: 70729)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007