Odlozinski, Michael Paul (CPSO#: 73397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone: (705) 323-9800
Fax: (705) 323-9601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Odlozinski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Odlozinski ( CPSO# 73397 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 323-9800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL PAUL ODLOZINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODLOZINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001