Odulana-Ogundimu, Adebola Oluremi (CPSO#: 56488)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AO Odulana-Ogundimu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Management LTD 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A5 Tel: 1-(800) 775-0093, Multispecialty Walk-In Clinic Tel: (905) 897-0788
Date Received: 25 May 2017


Address: Records Management Ltd Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, ON M9L 0A3 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933 2904
Instructions: The medical records for Primary Practice address: 1486 Regent Street South Sudbury, ON P3E 3Z6 will be stored at Records Management Ltd.
Date Received: 05 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017