Oei, Kwan Kie (CPSO#: 26231)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: American Sign Language, English, Indonesian

Education:Queen's University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015