Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Offman, Hilary Joy (CPSO#: 65524)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
121 Balmoral Avenue
Toronto ON  M4V 1J5
Phone: (416) 925-8330
Fax: (416) 925-2752
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Chisamore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Offman ( CPSO# 65524 )
Dr. B. Chisamore ( CPSO# 65361 )

Business Address:
Suite 405
27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 516-4111

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
NICU, 1st Floor, OLM Wing
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6067

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HILARY JOY OFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OFFMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993