Ofiesh, John George (CPSO#: 51301)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: Ofeish, John George (used until: 09 May 1984 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 1996