Ofori, Oyakhire Callistus (CPSO#: 100596)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:Obafemi Awolowo University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O.C. Ofori Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 12 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 1577 25th Street Bettendorf, IA 52722
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Dec 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 02 Dec 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017