Ogilvie, Jacqueline Dianne (CPSO#: 90984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8036
Fax: 519-685-8105
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline D. Ogilvie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ogilvie ( CPSO# 90984 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital
B1-127
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Developmental Paediatrics Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE DIANNE OGILVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGILVIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2016