Ogilvie, May (CPSO#: 21634)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009