Oglaza, Piotr Przemyslaw (CPSO#: 87777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical education
Queen's University
Faculty of Health Sciences
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2543
Fax: (613) 533-2132
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Verona Medical Clinic
P O Box 160
6582 Highway 38
Verona ON  K0H 2W0
Canada
Phone: (613) 374-2077
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Hastings Prince Edward PublicHealth
179 North Park Street
Belleville ON  K8P 4P1
Canada
Phone: 613 966 5500 Ext. 316
Fax: 613 966 4290
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Oglaza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Oglaza ( CPSO# 87777 )

Business Address:
Verona Medical Clinic
6582 Highway 38
P O Box 160
Verona ON  K0H 2W0
Phone Number: (613) 374-2077

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Denmark

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Nov 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIOTR PRZEMYSLAW OGLAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGLAZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 22 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2009 to 22 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009