Oguamanam, Joyce-Lyn Nkeiru (CPSO#: 102299)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Oct 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ghana, Hausa, Igbo

Education:ABIA STATE UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1887 Jane Street
North York ON  M9N 3S7
Phone: 647 340 6397
Fax: 647 350 6397
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

20 Rexdale Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z3
Canada
Phone: (647) 345-5040
Fax: (647) 345-5090
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joyce-Lyn Oguamanam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oguamanam ( CPSO# 102299)

Business Address:
20 - 20 Rexdale Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z3
Phone Number: (647) 345-5040

Business Address:
1887 Jane Street
North York ON  M9N 3S7
Phone Number: (647) 340-6397

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria
USA - Georgia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Oct 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Joyce-Lyn  Nkeiru  Oguamanam may practise medicine independently in family
            medicine.