Ogueri, Emmanuel (CPSO#: 92595)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2698 JANE STREET
2ND FLOOR, UNIT 4
Toronto ON  M3L 1S5
Phone: (647) 351-8877
Fax: (647) 352-4488
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emmanuel Ogueri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ogueri ( CPSO# 92595 )

Business Address:
4 - 2698 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3L 1S5
Phone Number: (647) 351-8877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMMANUEL OGUERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGUERI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2011