Ogundimu, Oluwabunmi Aderonke Ololade Olamide (CPSO#: 93626)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: (705) 739-5619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Oluwabunmi Ogundimu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ogundimu ( CPSO# 93626 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Division of Radiology Oncology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 25 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OLUWABUNMI ADERONKE OLOLADE OLAMIDE OGUNDIMU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGUNDIMU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 27 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 28 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 11 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Queen's University, 22 Jul 2015 to 25 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2015