Ogunkeye, Alarape Oluwatosin (CPSO#: 83240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
365 Vine Street
Unit 4
St Catharines ON  L2M 4T9
Phone: (905) 346-1050
Fax: (905) 346-1051
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ogunkeye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ogunkeye ( CPSO# 83240 )

Business Address:
4A - 365 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 4T9
Phone Number: (905) 346-1050

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALARAPE OLUWATOSIN OGUNKEYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGUNKEYE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 23 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010