Ogunmekan, Adeboye Oluwole (CPSO#: 42621)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Durham, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1988 to 28 Feb 1988
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1988