Ohayon, Jason Abraham (CPSO#: 66601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-1685 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1G5
Phone: (905) 777-0088
Fax: (905) 777-0018
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jason Ohayon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 20 2007

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 02 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON ABRAHAM OHAYON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHAYON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1997