Ohene-Darkoh, Charles Ayensu (CPSO#: 90435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Nov 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Nov 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

101 Humber College Blvd
WILLIAM OSLER HEALTH SYSYTEM
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Charles Ohene-Darkoh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ohene-Darkoh ( CPSO# 90435 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES AYENSU OHENE-DARKOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHENE-DARKOH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2009