Ohi, Masayoshi (CPSO#: 64827)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Toyama Ikayakkadaigaku, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1994 to 30 Apr 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1994