Ohrling, David Robert (CPSO#: 62149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Fourth St. W.
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1R7
Phone: (705) 888-9658
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Canada
Phone: (705) 445-2550
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David R. Ohrling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ohrling ( CPSO# 62149 )

Business Address:
130 Fourth Street West
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1R7
Phone Number: (705) 888-9658

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT OHRLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHRLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 1999 to 30 Nov 2000
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1992