Ohson, Kamal Krishna Singh (CPSO#: 72999)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Bombay, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
63 Airport Road
Suite #1
St John's NL  A1A 4Y3
Phone: (709) 739-7669
Fax: (709) 739-9898
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Outpatient Department
St Clare's Mercy Hospital
154 Lemarchant Road
Newfoundland
St Johns NL  A1C 5B8
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMAL KRISHNA SINGH OHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 20 Aug 1998 to 16 Sep 1998
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2001 to 30 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2001