Ohson, Ravinder Pal Singh (CPSO#: 55912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Delhi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rymal Square Health Centre
505 Rymal Road East
Hamilton ON  L8W 3X1
Phone: (905) 318-1444
Fax: (905) 318-0062
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ravinderpal Singh Ohson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ohson ( CPSO# 55912 )

Business Address:
505 Rymal Road East
Hamilton ON  L8W 3X1
Phone Number: (905) 318-1444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAVINDER PAL SINGH OHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OHSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989