Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Oiknine, Albert (CPSO#: 70727)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2000