Ojah, Cecil Ravindranath (CPSO#: 57506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint John Regional Hospital
P O Box 2100
Saint John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-6111
Fax: (506) 648-6790

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECIL RAVINDRANATH OJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OJAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1988