Ojha, Sujata (CPSO#: 108061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Mar 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Western Ontario
Schulich School of Medicine
Department of Psychiatry
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 667-6664
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ojha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ojha ( CPSO# 102774)
Dr. S. Ojha ( CPSO# 108061)

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
University of Western Ontario
Schulich School of Medicine
Department of Psychiatry
550 Wellington Road South
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Mar 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Sep 2015 to 12 Oct 2015
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 13 Oct 2015 to 28 Feb 2016
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 29 Feb 2016 to 12 Oct 2016
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sujata Ojha may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Psychiatry, The University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Ojha
                        holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Ojha no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Ojha's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Ojha's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on March 15, 2017, and expires on June 30,
                  2019.  Upon renewal of Dr. Ojha's academic appointment at the University
                  of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the
                  limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.