Ojo, Otegbola (CPSO#: 51306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nigeria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 30, 2015, the following voluntary cease-to-practise
            Undertaking, Acknowledgement and Consent by Dr. Otegbola Ojo is imposed as a
            term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr.
            Ojo:



                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of

                                    DR. OTEGBOLA OJO
                                          ("Dr. Ojo")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Ojo, certificate of registration number 51306, am a member of the
                  College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement
                  to participate in a program of continuing professional development.    

            (2)   I, Dr. Ojo, have ceased to practise medicine due to retirement. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Ojo, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise
                  medicine in any jurisdiction until each and every one of the following
                  conditions have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (4)   I, Dr. Ojo, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward
                  a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                  ("OHIP") that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered
                  after the date I cease to practise and before the date the College agrees
                  that I may return to practise in accordance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. If I do not have an active Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                  ("OHIP") billing number, I undertake to provide proof of same to the
                  College.

            (5)   I, Dr. Ojo, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (6)   I, Dr. Ojo, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
                  this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Ojo, acknowledge and agree that in considering my request to
                  return to practice, the Registrar may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Ojo, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Ojo, undertake to comply with the provisions  of this Undertaking
                  and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
                  may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee of the College.

            (10)  I, Dr. Ojo, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Ojo, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
                  is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
                  c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (12)  I, Dr. Ojo, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Ojo has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to
                        retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any
                        medical advice or services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (13)  I, Dr. Ojo, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and any person or institution who may have
                  relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance
                  with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Ojo, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Otegbola Ojo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 30, 2015:

Dr. Ojo has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.